THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:20:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Duncan Mill Rd
Suite 800
North York ON M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-492-5633
Fax: 416-495-1590
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Turks and Caicos Islands

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dale V. Dantzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dantzer (CPSO#: 75259 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Duncan Mill Rd
Suite 800
North York ON M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-492-5633
Fax: 416-495-1590
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Turks and Caicos Islands

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dale V. Dantzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dantzer (CPSO#: 75259 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALE VICTOR DANTZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANTZER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALE VICTOR DANTZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANTZER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000