THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:06:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
1051 Queen Street West
Crisis and Critical Care Building
Unit 2309
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 32841
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Lustig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lustig (CPSO#: 75270 )
Business Address: CAMH College Street Site
Suite 501
250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
(416) 535-8501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
1051 Queen Street West
Crisis and Critical Care Building
Unit 2309
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 32841
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Lustig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lustig (CPSO#: 75270 )
Business Address: CAMH College Street Site
Suite 501
250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
(416) 535-8501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JASON MARK LUSTIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUSTIG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JASON MARK LUSTIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUSTIG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000