THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:13:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universiteti i Tiranes, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ALBANIAN, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208 - 2425 Tecumseh Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-2778
Fax: (519) 258-3102
Address: Suite 200
2462 Howard
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 258-4143
Fax: (519) 258-4456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Yakoub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yakoub (CPSO#: 75273 )
Business Address: Suite 208
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N9W 1E6
(519) 258-2778

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ALBANIAN, ITALIAN
Medical School: Universiteti i Tiranes, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208 - 2425 Tecumseh Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-2778
Fax: (519) 258-3102
Address: Suite 200
2462 Howard
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 258-4143
Fax: (519) 258-4456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Yakoub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yakoub (CPSO#: 75273 )
Business Address: Suite 208
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N9W 1E6
(519) 258-2778

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELVIRA YAKOUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAKOUB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELVIRA YAKOUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAKOUB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universiteti i Tiranes, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000