THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:49:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Asyut University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lisgar Woods Medical Centre
Unit B 2
6970 Lisgar Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 8C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 824-4441
Fax: (905) 824-4431

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maximous Abdel-Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdel-Malek (CPSO#: 75282 )
Business Address: Lisgar Woods Medical Centre
B2 - 6970 Lisgar Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 8C8
(905) 824-4441

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Asyut University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lisgar Woods Medical Centre
Unit B 2
6970 Lisgar Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 8C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 824-4441
Fax: (905) 824-4431

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maximous Abdel-Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdel-Malek (CPSO#: 75282 )
Business Address: Lisgar Woods Medical Centre
B2 - 6970 Lisgar Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 8C8
(905) 824-4441

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAXIMOUS YOUSSEF MEIKAEL ABDEL-MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAXIMOUS YOUSSEF MEIKAEL ABDEL-MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 21 Jan 2010
Summary of Decision:
On January 21, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. AbdelMalek committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional.

Between 1978 and 1994, Dr. AbdelMalek was a general practitioner and general surgeon in Egpyt. He did a locum in Saudi Arabia between February and September 1994. In 1994, Dr. AbdelMalek immigrated to Canada. Between his arrival in Canada in 1994 and 1998, Dr. AbdelMalek had various occupations and engaged in various medical educational pursuits. He did not practise medicine during this time. In 2000, Dr. AbdelMalek applied to the CPSO for a Certificate of Registration, and was registered to carry on independent practice in June 2000. Dr. AbdelMalek admits that the information he supplied to the CPSO on his applications was not accurate, in that it overstated the duration of his practice in Egypt, failed to disclose interruptions in practice after he came to Canada in 1994, and did not disclose his period of practice in Saudi Arabia.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. AbdelMalek successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course on the next available date, and in any event within six months of the date of the Order, and provide proof thereof to the College.

2. Dr. AbdelMalek appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. AbdelMalek pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of the Order.

4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 21, 2010

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Feb 2018
Summary:
Effective October 17, 2019, Dr. Abdel-Malek has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 21 Jan 2010
Summary of Decision:
On January 21, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. AbdelMalek committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional.

Between 1978 and 1994, Dr. AbdelMalek was a general practitioner and general surgeon in Egpyt. He did a locum in Saudi Arabia between February and September 1994. In 1994, Dr. AbdelMalek immigrated to Canada. Between his arrival in Canada in 1994 and 1998, Dr. AbdelMalek had various occupations and engaged in various medical educational pursuits. He did not practise medicine during this time. In 2000, Dr. AbdelMalek applied to the CPSO for a Certificate of Registration, and was registered to carry on independent practice in June 2000. Dr. AbdelMalek admits that the information he supplied to the CPSO on his applications was not accurate, in that it overstated the duration of his practice in Egypt, failed to disclose interruptions in practice after he came to Canada in 1994, and did not disclose his period of practice in Saudi Arabia.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. AbdelMalek successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course on the next available date, and in any event within six months of the date of the Order, and provide proof thereof to the College.

2. Dr. AbdelMalek appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. AbdelMalek pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of the Order.

4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 21, 2010

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Feb 2018
Summary:
Effective October 17, 2019, Dr. Abdel-Malek has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Asyut University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2000