THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:42:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WestBram Family Physicians
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1244
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grant de Groot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. de Groot (CPSO#: 75286 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WestBram Family Physicians
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1244
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grant de Groot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. de Groot (CPSO#: 75286 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRANT GERALD DE GROOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE GROOT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRANT GERALD DE GROOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE GROOT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2000