THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:10:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Whites Medical Clinic
727 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M6N 4B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 763-8880
Fax: (416) 763-3444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Kanhai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Salem (CPSO#: 75306 ) Dr. N. Kanhai (CPSO#: 74946 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: 727 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M6N 4B3
(416) 763-8880

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Whites Medical Clinic
727 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M6N 4B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 763-8880
Fax: (416) 763-3444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Kanhai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Salem (CPSO#: 75306 ) Dr. N. Kanhai (CPSO#: 74946 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: 727 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M6N 4B3
(416) 763-8880

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHERIEN SALEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHERIEN SALEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000