THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:24:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
55 Edinborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Extension: 52796
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Tabib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tabib (CPSO#: 75356 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 566-6055

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
55 Edinborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Extension: 52796
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Tabib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tabib (CPSO#: 75356 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 566-6055

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED AHMED TABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED AHMED TABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000