THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:08:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 365 WEST ST.
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 426-6262
Fax: (519) 426-6261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Naas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naas (CPSO#: 75453 )
Business Address: 479 - 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(519) 426-6262

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 365 WEST ST.
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 426-6262
Fax: (519) 426-6261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Naas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naas (CPSO#: 75453 )
Business Address: 479 - 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(519) 426-6262

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULBASITT M MOHAMMAD NAAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULBASITT M MOHAMMAD NAAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2000