THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:23:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Al-Arab Medical University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West Room 248
P O Box 2000
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46698
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 King St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1A1
Phone: 2892046794
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Cir
mississauga pain clinic
suite 220
Mississauga ON L5N 2Y1
Phone: 9058588512
Fax: 9058583527

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Madi Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ali (CPSO#: 75546 )
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44890
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44890
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44890
Business Address: 726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9
(905) 575-5743

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Al-Arab Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West Room 248
P O Box 2000
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46698
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 King St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1A1
Phone: 2892046794
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Cir
mississauga pain clinic
suite 220
Mississauga ON L5N 2Y1
Phone: 9058588512
Fax: 9058583527

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Madi Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ali (CPSO#: 75546 )
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44890
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44890
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44890
Business Address: 726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9
(905) 575-5743

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADI MOHAMED MADI ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADI MOHAMED MADI ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Al-Arab Medical University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2000