THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:03:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 797-0800
Fax: (705) 797-0900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kazmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kazmi (CPSO#: 75569 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 797-0800
Fax: (705) 797-0900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kazmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kazmi (CPSO#: 75569 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASIF ABBAS KAZMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASIF ABBAS KAZMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2000