THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103,
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-2888
Fax: (905) 456-2868

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aptekar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Aptekar (CPSO#: 75570 )
Business Address: Suite 103
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Embry Healthcare Centre
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 456-2888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103,
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-2888
Fax: (905) 456-2868

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aptekar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Aptekar (CPSO#: 75570 )
Business Address: Suite 103
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Embry Healthcare Centre
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 456-2888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAFISA JACOB APTEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APTEKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAFISA JACOB APTEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APTEKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nagpur University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2000