THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Vitebsk State Medical Institute, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Cardiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 7370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416 323 6400
Extension: 4241
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 4076
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Phone: (647) 347-6644
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eugene Crystal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Crystal (CPSO#: 75607 )
Business Address: 3695 Keele St
North York ON M3J 1N2
4166307540
Business Address: 4076 - 3080 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
(647) 347-4466
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Cardiology Department
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 7370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Vitebsk State Medical Institute, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Cardiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 7370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416 323 6400
Extension: 4241
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 4076
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Phone: (647) 347-6644
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eugene Crystal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Crystal (CPSO#: 75607 )
Business Address: 3695 Keele St
North York ON M3J 1N2
4166307540
Business Address: 4076 - 3080 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
(647) 347-4466
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Cardiology Department
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 7370

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Nov 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 20 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Eugene Crystal may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Eugene Crystal may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Vitebsk State Medical Institute, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2000