THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:09:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southwood Medical Clinic
Suite 1
3950 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9G 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 966-6777
Fax: (519) 916-0218

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rashi Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mehta (CPSO#: 75610 )
Business Address: 1-3950 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON N9G 1X2
519-966-6777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southwood Medical Clinic
Suite 1
3950 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9G 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 966-6777
Fax: (519) 916-0218

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rashi Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mehta (CPSO#: 75610 )
Business Address: 1-3950 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON N9G 1X2
519-966-6777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHI JINDAL MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHI JINDAL MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Sep 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2000