THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:17:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: University of Ottawa
Health Sciences Centre
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa, ON
K1N 6N5
Date Received: 03 Jun 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ballou Vanasse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vanasse (CPSO#: 75683 ) Dr. S. Ballou (CPSO#: 75716 )
Business Address: 299 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1L 7G1
(613) 748-0657
Business Address: University of Ottawa
Health Sciences Centre
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
(613) 564-3950
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: University of Ottawa
Health Sciences Centre
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa, ON
K1N 6N5
Date Received: 03 Jun 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ballou Vanasse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vanasse (CPSO#: 75683 ) Dr. S. Ballou (CPSO#: 75716 )
Business Address: 299 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1L 7G1
(613) 748-0657
Business Address: University of Ottawa
Health Sciences Centre
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
(613) 564-3950
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2000