THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:03:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Gynecolologic Oncology
Room 8168
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 76462
Fax: (613) 737-8828

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weberpals Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weberpals (CPSO#: 75702 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Gynecolologic Oncology
Room 8168
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 76462
Fax: (613) 737-8828

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weberpals Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weberpals (CPSO#: 75702 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNE INGRID WEBERPALS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBERPALS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNE INGRID WEBERPALS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBERPALS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Oct 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2000