THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: Fenster, Joanne M (Used Until: 11 Oct 2004)
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2760 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M4N 2J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 481-1173
Fax: (416) 481-7431

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grevler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grevler (CPSO#: 75709 )

General Information

Former Name: Fenster, Joanne M (Used Until: 11 Oct 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2760 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M4N 2J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 481-1173
Fax: (416) 481-7431

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grevler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grevler (CPSO#: 75709 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE M GREVLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREVLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE M GREVLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREVLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2000
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2000