THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:07:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-751-5544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St.
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: 519 822 5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Mathers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mathers (CPSO#: 75731 )
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-751-5544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St.
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: 519 822 5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Mathers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mathers (CPSO#: 75731 )
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL GORDON MATHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL GORDON MATHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 May 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 May 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2000