THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 422-3861
Fax: (613) 422-7538

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suneil Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kapur (CPSO#: 75763 )
Business Address: 203 - 139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9A5
(613) 422-3861

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 422-3861
Fax: (613) 422-7538

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suneil Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kapur (CPSO#: 75763 )
Business Address: 203 - 139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9A5
(613) 422-3861

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNEIL KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNEIL KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2000