THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:14:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph Health Care
Department of Anesthesia
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33853
Fax: (905) 521-6019

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 23 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rafik Bolis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bolis (CPSO#: 75769 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph Health Care
Department of Anesthesia
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33853
Fax: (905) 521-6019

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 23 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rafik Bolis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bolis (CPSO#: 75769 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAFIK SOBHY BOLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAFIK SOBHY BOLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2000
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2000