THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:40:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinic of Orthopaedic Medicine
Suite 403
2555 Boulevard St Joseph
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 824-4223
Fax: (613) 824-2418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erik Ouellette Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ouellette (CPSO#: 75791 )
Business Address: Clinic of Orthopaedic Medicine
Suite 206
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 824-4223
Business Address: 2555 St-Joseph Boulevard
Suite 403
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
613-824-4223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinic of Orthopaedic Medicine
Suite 403
2555 Boulevard St Joseph
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 824-4223
Fax: (613) 824-2418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erik Ouellette Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ouellette (CPSO#: 75791 )
Business Address: Clinic of Orthopaedic Medicine
Suite 206
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 824-4223
Business Address: 2555 St-Joseph Boulevard
Suite 403
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
613-824-4223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIK OUELLETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLETTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIK OUELLETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLETTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jan 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2000