THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuban Medical Institute, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 495
5 Fairview Mall Dr.
North York Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 352 7618
Fax: 647 689 2797
Address: 117 King St East
Oshawa Ontario L1H1B9
Phone: 905 721 4986
Fax: 905 721 6602
Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
Phone: 905 7214986
Fax: 905 7216602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Lisnevskaia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lisnevskaia (CPSO#: 75802 )
Business Address: 495 - 5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-4987

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Kuban Medical Institute, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 495
5 Fairview Mall Dr.
North York Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 352 7618
Fax: 647 689 2797
Address: 117 King St East
Oshawa Ontario L1H1B9
Phone: 905 721 4986
Fax: 905 721 6602
Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
Phone: 905 7214986
Fax: 905 7216602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Lisnevskaia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lisnevskaia (CPSO#: 75802 )
Business Address: 495 - 5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-4987

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARISSA ALEXANDROVNA LISNEVSKAIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISNEVSKAIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARISSA ALEXANDROVNA LISNEVSKAIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISNEVSKAIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuban Medical Institute, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2000