THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Cybulski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cybulski (CPSO#: 75803 )
Business Address: 202 - 148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1L3
(519) 954-6170
Business Address: PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1Z0
5197494300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Cybulski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cybulski (CPSO#: 75803 )
Business Address: 202 - 148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1L3
(519) 954-6170
Business Address: PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1Z0
5197494300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER ANDREW CYBULSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYBULSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER ANDREW CYBULSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYBULSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2001