THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 03:17:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sind, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dynamic Medical Centre
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2M 4E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932
Address: 10 Cottrelle Blvd,
Unit 207
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
Phone: (647) 970-9522
Fax: (905) 567-7579
Address: 40 Holly Street
Suite 3
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
Phone: 416 486 8088
Fax: 416 486 7888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 24 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jokhio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jokhio (CPSO#: 75833 )
Business Address: Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
(416) 486-8088

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU
Medical School: University of Sind, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dynamic Medical Centre
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2M 4E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932
Address: 10 Cottrelle Blvd,
Unit 207
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
Phone: (647) 970-9522
Fax: (905) 567-7579
Address: 40 Holly Street
Suite 3
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
Phone: 416 486 8088
Fax: 416 486 7888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 24 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jokhio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jokhio (CPSO#: 75833 )
Business Address: Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
(416) 486-8088

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAZA MUSTAFA JOKHIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOKHIO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAZA MUSTAFA JOKHIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOKHIO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sind, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2001
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2001