THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 20:22:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bucharest, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Medical Centre
85 The East Mall, Suite 400
Toronto Ontario M8Z 5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Adrian Savin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Savin (CPSO#: 75842 )
Business Address: Etobicoke Medical Centre
400 - 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W4
(416) 621-2220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Bucharest, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Medical Centre
85 The East Mall, Suite 400
Toronto Ontario M8Z 5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Adrian Savin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Savin (CPSO#: 75842 )
Business Address: Etobicoke Medical Centre
400 - 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W4
(416) 621-2220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIAN GABRIEL SAVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIAN GABRIEL SAVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 28 Nov 2018
Summary:

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 28 Nov 2018
Summary:

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: University of Bucharest, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2001