THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 4200
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 741-1402
Fax: 7057413987

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Holwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Holwell (CPSO#: 75845 )
Business Address: 707 Charlotte Street
PO Box 4200
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 741-1402

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 4200
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 741-1402
Fax: 7057413987

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Holwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Holwell (CPSO#: 75845 )
Business Address: 707 Charlotte Street
PO Box 4200
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 741-1402

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK HOLWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK HOLWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 21 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Feb 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2001