THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universit of Tuzla, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clarington FHO
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: (905) 623-9607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radinka Boskovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Boskovic (CPSO#: 75880 )
Business Address: Clarington FHO
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 632-2355

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN
Medical School: Universit of Tuzla, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clarington FHO
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: (905) 623-9607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radinka Boskovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Boskovic (CPSO#: 75880 )
Business Address: Clarington FHO
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 632-2355

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RADINKA BOSKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSKOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RADINKA BOSKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universit of Tuzla, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2001
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2001