THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:35:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Pecs, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LOFHT - Hawkesbury Medical Canter
151 Main Street E.
Suite 123
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Extension: 0
Fax: 613-632-1073
Address: 1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury
Ontario, K6A 3G5
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A1
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Claude Landa Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Landa (CPSO#: 75886 )
Business Address: 123-151 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A1

Corporation Name: Jean-Claude Landa Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Medical University of Pecs, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LOFHT - Hawkesbury Medical Canter
151 Main Street E.
Suite 123
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Extension: 0
Fax: 613-632-1073
Address: 1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury
Ontario, K6A 3G5
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A1
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Claude Landa Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Landa (CPSO#: 75886 )
Business Address: 123-151 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A1

Corporation Name: Jean-Claude Landa Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-CLAUDE LEE LANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-CLAUDE LEE LANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Pecs, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2001