THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3869 Jane Street
Intrepid Health Jane & Finch
Downsview
Toronto Ontario M3N 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: Tel: 647-776-1990
Fax: Fax: 416-754-4340
Address: YORKWOODS MEDICAL CENTRE
2867 Jane Street
Downsview Ontario M3N 2J5
Phone: (416) 398-9555
Fax: (416) 630-7231

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asmal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asmal (CPSO#: 75900 )
Business Address: Medcare Jane-Finch Mall
3869 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M3N 2K4
(416) 636-7077

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3869 Jane Street
Intrepid Health Jane & Finch
Downsview
Toronto Ontario M3N 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: Tel: 647-776-1990
Fax: Fax: 416-754-4340
Address: YORKWOODS MEDICAL CENTRE
2867 Jane Street
Downsview Ontario M3N 2J5
Phone: (416) 398-9555
Fax: (416) 630-7231

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asmal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asmal (CPSO#: 75900 )
Business Address: Medcare Jane-Finch Mall
3869 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M3N 2K4
(416) 636-7077

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ZUBHEIR DAWOOD ASMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASMAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ZUBHEIR DAWOOD ASMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASMAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 07 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2001