THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:48:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Rockhaven Lane
Suite 106
Waterdown Ontario L8B 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 390-3033
Fax: (905) 390-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lad-Todd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Todd (CPSO#: 75965 ) Dr. T. Lad (CPSO#: 77400 )
Business Address: 106 - 170 Rockhaven Lane
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H6
(905) 390-3033

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Rockhaven Lane
Suite 106
Waterdown Ontario L8B 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 390-3033
Fax: (905) 390-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lad-Todd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Todd (CPSO#: 75965 ) Dr. T. Lad (CPSO#: 77400 )
Business Address: 106 - 170 Rockhaven Lane
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H6
(905) 390-3033

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 May 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 May 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2001