THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:17:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 113 John St. South
Aylmer Ontario N5H 2C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 765-1960
Fax: (519) 765-2971
Address: St Thomas Walk In Clinic Aylmer
Suite 105
230 First Avenue
St Thomas Ontario N5R 4P5
Phone: (519) 633-9628
Fax: (519) 633-2677

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Vivoda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Vivoda (CPSO#: 75971 )
Business Address: 113 John Street South
Aylmer Ontario N5H 2C3
(519) 765-1960

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 113 John St. South
Aylmer Ontario N5H 2C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 765-1960
Fax: (519) 765-2971
Address: St Thomas Walk In Clinic Aylmer
Suite 105
230 First Avenue
St Thomas Ontario N5R 4P5
Phone: (519) 633-9628
Fax: (519) 633-2677

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Vivoda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Vivoda (CPSO#: 75971 )
Business Address: 113 John Street South
Aylmer Ontario N5H 2C3
(519) 765-1960

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD ERNEST VIVODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIVODA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD ERNEST VIVODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIVODA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2001