THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:18:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Westheights Medical Clinic
203 - 10 Westheights Dr
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 954-7742
Fax: (519) 954-7743

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Mourcos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mourcos (CPSO#: 76018 )
Business Address: 203 - 10 Westheights Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
(519) 578-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Westheights Medical Clinic
203 - 10 Westheights Dr
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 954-7742
Fax: (519) 954-7743

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Mourcos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mourcos (CPSO#: 76018 )
Business Address: 203 - 10 Westheights Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
(519) 578-5555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHRAF FEKRY ZAKI MOURCOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOURCOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHRAF FEKRY ZAKI MOURCOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOURCOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 15 Jan 2018
Summary of Decision:
On January 15, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dr. Ashraf Fekry Zaki Mourcos committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr.Mourcos is a family physician who received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 2001. At the relevant time, Dr. Mourcos practised family medicine in his clinic in Kitchener.

Disgraceful Dishonourable or Unprofessional Conduct regarding Ms A

In or around March 2013, Ms A commenced employment for Dr. Mourcos as medical receptionist. She was in her early thirties at the time. She is married. Her job involved answering telephones, filing, booking appointments, collecting urine samples and taking patients to examination rooms.

In June 2013, after the last patient for the day had left, Ms A and Dr. Mourcos were alone in the office and engaged in conversation. It had been a very busy day, with several patient appointments, and Ms A commented that it had been a rough day. Dr. Mourcos responded that she looked tense. She said “Yeah” and was rubbing her neck and shoulders due to upper back pain. Dr. Mourcos offered to give her a massage. He had offered massages on earlier occasions, and had massaged the back of her neck while she sat at her desk working. On those occasions, Ms A agreed to the massage and when she asked Dr. Mourcos to stop, he stopped. On that day, Ms A declined Dr. Mourcos’ offer and told him she did not need a massage. When Dr. Mourcos persisted, telling her that this would be a good practice for him as he was taking classes in massage therapy, Ms A gave in and agreed to the massage.


After rubbing her shoulders while standing behind her at her desk for about a minute, Dr. Morcous told Ms A he could not massage her in the reception area and asked her to go into an examination room. When Ms A went into the examination room and sat on a stool, Dr. Mourcos went into his office briefly and, unbeknownst to Ms A at the time, locked the main entrance to the office. Dr. Mourcos then entered the examination room and told Ms A that he could give her a better massage if she lay down on the examination table. Ms A lay on the examination table face down and Dr. Mourcos commenced massaging her back over top of her shirt. She was wearing scrubs at the time. Dr. Mourcos then inserted his hands underneath her shirt. Ms A did not object to this touching as she felt it was like a regular massage. Dr. Mourcos began touching her lower back and moving his hands down her back towards the waistband of her pants. Ms A felt Dr. Mourcos slip his hand underneath the waistband of her pants and move his hand towards her right hip. He asked if he could massage under her pants and she said “no”. Dr. Mourcos then moved his hand upwards and continued to massage Ms A’s back under her shirt for about a minute. He then moved his hands towards Ms A’s mid-back and unclasped her bra, while Ms A did not realize it. Without warning or consent, Dr. Mourcos moved his right hand toward her right breast, placing his fingers on the side and upper part of her right breast for a couple of seconds. Ms A sat up quickly, and ended the massage. At that point, Ms A realized that her bra was undone. She struggled to do it up. Dr. Mourcos stood at the doorway, and told her everything was “okay”. When Dr. Mourcos asked if he could help her with her bra, Ms. A was in shock and did not respond. Dr. Mourcos inserted his hands under her shirt, and helped her do up her bra. As she moved towards the door to leave the exam room, Dr. Mourcos stood at the doorway and repeated “it’s okay”. He asked Ms A to kiss him. Ms A said no. He leaned in to kiss her, but Ms A turned her head and he ended up kissing her on the cheek. He stepped back from the door so she could leave.

Ms A left the examining room and returned to her desk in the reception area. Shortly thereafter, Dr. Mourcos engaged her in conversation in the reception area asking her about her marriage and whether she had engaged in sexual relations with other people. The conversation ended when the phone rang and Ms A attended to the call. At that time, Dr. Mourcos returned to his office. He then unlocked the main door to the office. Ms A finished her duties for the day and left the office. She was upset about what had occurred. She told her mother what happened and then contacted police that evening. She did not return to work.

Disposition

The Discipline Committee ordered that:

- the Registrar suspend Dr. Mourcos’ certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, to commence immediately.
- the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Mourcos’ certificate of registration:
- Dr. Mourcos shall be subject to workplace monitoring in all practice locations by a regulated health professional, approved by the College, who executes an undertaking with the College in the form attached as Appendix “A” (Office Practice) or “B” (Other Practice Locations) (the “Practice Monitor”). Monitoring shall continue for a minimum period of two years in each of Dr. Mourcos’ practice locations and shall continue, in the College’s sole discretion, if reports are unsatisfactory;
- The Practice Monitor(s) shall be required to, among other things:
- provide written reports to the College on a quarterly basis. Such reports are to include information regarding Dr. Mourcos’ conduct, behavior, and professionalism including information provided to the Practice Monitor by nurses, medical staff and/or any other staff working directly or indirectly with Dr. Mourcos; and
- provide immediate reporting to the College if the Practice Monitor has any concerns about Dr. Mourcos’ conduct, behavior or professionalism, concerns that people or patients in the workplace may be at risk of harm, or concerns that Dr. Mourcos is not in compliance with the panel’s Order;

- Dr. Mourcos shall provide an executed Appendix “A” and “B” from a College approved Practice Monitor no later than thirty (30) days before he resumes practice following his suspension. If the person who has given an undertaking in the form of Appendix “A” or “B” is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, or the College determines the Practice Monitor is no longer acceptable, Dr. Mourcos shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time. If Dr. Mourcos is unable to obtain a Practice Monitor on the terms set out in this Order, he shall cease practising medicine until such time as he has obtained a Practice Monitor acceptable to the College on the terms set out above;
- Dr. Mourcos shall provide written notice to the College at least thirty (30) days before seeking privileges, employment or any other position, at any hospital, independent health facility, out-of-hospital premise, facility, or any other location. Dr. Mourcos shall inform the College within ten (10) days of the date he receives notice that he has been granted such privileges, employment or position. Dr. Mourcos shall ensure that he has obtained an undertaking in the form of Appendix “B” from a College-approved regulated health professional who works at that location and shall provide same to the College before commencing work at such location;
- Dr. Mourcos shall ensure that all individuals who work in his office, whether employed by him or not, review this Order and the Statement of Uncontested Facts by no later than January 30, 2018 and review the Decision and Reasons of the Discipline Committee within 15 days of its release.
- Dr. Mourcos shall ensure that any new individual hired to work in his office shall review this Order, the Statement of Uncontested Facts and the Decision and Reasons of the Discipline Committee prior to commencing work at Dr. Mourcos’ office. 
- Dr. Mourcos shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the terms of this Order.
- Dr. Mourcos attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Mourcos pay the College costs in the amount of $5,500 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Jan 15, 2018

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 15 Jan 2018
Summary of Decision:
On January 15, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dr. Ashraf Fekry Zaki Mourcos committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr.Mourcos is a family physician who received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 2001. At the relevant time, Dr. Mourcos practised family medicine in his clinic in Kitchener.

Disgraceful Dishonourable or Unprofessional Conduct regarding Ms A

In or around March 2013, Ms A commenced employment for Dr. Mourcos as medical receptionist. She was in her early thirties at the time. She is married. Her job involved answering telephones, filing, booking appointments, collecting urine samples and taking patients to examination rooms.

In June 2013, after the last patient for the day had left, Ms A and Dr. Mourcos were alone in the office and engaged in conversation. It had been a very busy day, with several patient appointments, and Ms A commented that it had been a rough day. Dr. Mourcos responded that she looked tense. She said “Yeah” and was rubbing her neck and shoulders due to upper back pain. Dr. Mourcos offered to give her a massage. He had offered massages on earlier occasions, and had massaged the back of her neck while she sat at her desk working. On those occasions, Ms A agreed to the massage and when she asked Dr. Mourcos to stop, he stopped. On that day, Ms A declined Dr. Mourcos’ offer and told him she did not need a massage. When Dr. Mourcos persisted, telling her that this would be a good practice for him as he was taking classes in massage therapy, Ms A gave in and agreed to the massage.


After rubbing her shoulders while standing behind her at her desk for about a minute, Dr. Morcous told Ms A he could not massage her in the reception area and asked her to go into an examination room. When Ms A went into the examination room and sat on a stool, Dr. Mourcos went into his office briefly and, unbeknownst to Ms A at the time, locked the main entrance to the office. Dr. Mourcos then entered the examination room and told Ms A that he could give her a better massage if she lay down on the examination table. Ms A lay on the examination table face down and Dr. Mourcos commenced massaging her back over top of her shirt. She was wearing scrubs at the time. Dr. Mourcos then inserted his hands underneath her shirt. Ms A did not object to this touching as she felt it was like a regular massage. Dr. Mourcos began touching her lower back and moving his hands down her back towards the waistband of her pants. Ms A felt Dr. Mourcos slip his hand underneath the waistband of her pants and move his hand towards her right hip. He asked if he could massage under her pants and she said “no”. Dr. Mourcos then moved his hand upwards and continued to massage Ms A’s back under her shirt for about a minute. He then moved his hands towards Ms A’s mid-back and unclasped her bra, while Ms A did not realize it. Without warning or consent, Dr. Mourcos moved his right hand toward her right breast, placing his fingers on the side and upper part of her right breast for a couple of seconds. Ms A sat up quickly, and ended the massage. At that point, Ms A realized that her bra was undone. She struggled to do it up. Dr. Mourcos stood at the doorway, and told her everything was “okay”. When Dr. Mourcos asked if he could help her with her bra, Ms. A was in shock and did not respond. Dr. Mourcos inserted his hands under her shirt, and helped her do up her bra. As she moved towards the door to leave the exam room, Dr. Mourcos stood at the doorway and repeated “it’s okay”. He asked Ms A to kiss him. Ms A said no. He leaned in to kiss her, but Ms A turned her head and he ended up kissing her on the cheek. He stepped back from the door so she could leave.

Ms A left the examining room and returned to her desk in the reception area. Shortly thereafter, Dr. Mourcos engaged her in conversation in the reception area asking her about her marriage and whether she had engaged in sexual relations with other people. The conversation ended when the phone rang and Ms A attended to the call. At that time, Dr. Mourcos returned to his office. He then unlocked the main door to the office. Ms A finished her duties for the day and left the office. She was upset about what had occurred. She told her mother what happened and then contacted police that evening. She did not return to work.

Disposition

The Discipline Committee ordered that:

- the Registrar suspend Dr. Mourcos’ certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, to commence immediately.
- the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Mourcos’ certificate of registration:
- Dr. Mourcos shall be subject to workplace monitoring in all practice locations by a regulated health professional, approved by the College, who executes an undertaking with the College in the form attached as Appendix “A” (Office Practice) or “B” (Other Practice Locations) (the “Practice Monitor”). Monitoring shall continue for a minimum period of two years in each of Dr. Mourcos’ practice locations and shall continue, in the College’s sole discretion, if reports are unsatisfactory;
- The Practice Monitor(s) shall be required to, among other things:
- provide written reports to the College on a quarterly basis. Such reports are to include information regarding Dr. Mourcos’ conduct, behavior, and professionalism including information provided to the Practice Monitor by nurses, medical staff and/or any other staff working directly or indirectly with Dr. Mourcos; and
- provide immediate reporting to the College if the Practice Monitor has any concerns about Dr. Mourcos’ conduct, behavior or professionalism, concerns that people or patients in the workplace may be at risk of harm, or concerns that Dr. Mourcos is not in compliance with the panel’s Order;

- Dr. Mourcos shall provide an executed Appendix “A” and “B” from a College approved Practice Monitor no later than thirty (30) days before he resumes practice following his suspension. If the person who has given an undertaking in the form of Appendix “A” or “B” is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, or the College determines the Practice Monitor is no longer acceptable, Dr. Mourcos shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time. If Dr. Mourcos is unable to obtain a Practice Monitor on the terms set out in this Order, he shall cease practising medicine until such time as he has obtained a Practice Monitor acceptable to the College on the terms set out above;
- Dr. Mourcos shall provide written notice to the College at least thirty (30) days before seeking privileges, employment or any other position, at any hospital, independent health facility, out-of-hospital premise, facility, or any other location. Dr. Mourcos shall inform the College within ten (10) days of the date he receives notice that he has been granted such privileges, employment or position. Dr. Mourcos shall ensure that he has obtained an undertaking in the form of Appendix “B” from a College-approved regulated health professional who works at that location and shall provide same to the College before commencing work at such location;
- Dr. Mourcos shall ensure that all individuals who work in his office, whether employed by him or not, review this Order and the Statement of Uncontested Facts by no later than January 30, 2018 and review the Decision and Reasons of the Discipline Committee within 15 days of its release.
- Dr. Mourcos shall ensure that any new individual hired to work in his office shall review this Order, the Statement of Uncontested Facts and the Decision and Reasons of the Discipline Committee prior to commencing work at Dr. Mourcos’ office. 
- Dr. Mourcos shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the terms of this Order.
- Dr. Mourcos attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Mourcos pay the College costs in the amount of $5,500 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Jan 15, 2018

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2020
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 15 Jul 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2001