THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:45:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
8 North
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Fax: (416) 756-6424

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Regina Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Liu (CPSO#: 76029 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
8 North
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6655

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
8 North
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Fax: (416) 756-6424

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Regina Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Liu (CPSO#: 76029 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
8 North
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6655

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REGINA CHING-YIN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REGINA CHING-YIN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001