THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:11:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Gastroenterology
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75013
Fax: (905) 521-2655
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 26552
Fax: (905) 863-2468
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Extension: 33513
Fax: (905) 863-2468
Address: Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Herbert Brill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Brill (CPSO#: 76046 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Suite 3A-23
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73455
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(416) 494-2120 Extn: 57351
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
S.3.052
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 57351
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120 Extn: 57351

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Gastroenterology
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75013
Fax: (905) 521-2655
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 26552
Fax: (905) 863-2468
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Extension: 33513
Fax: (905) 863-2468
Address: Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Herbert Brill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Brill (CPSO#: 76046 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Suite 3A-23
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73455
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(416) 494-2120 Extn: 57351
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
S.3.052
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 57351
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120 Extn: 57351

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERBERT BRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERBERT BRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001