THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:16:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Hospital
Room D2 105
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6242
Fax: (519) 646-6221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherry Rohekar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rohekar (CPSO#: 76058 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
Room D2-105
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6242

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Hospital
Room D2 105
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6242
Fax: (519) 646-6221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherry Rohekar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rohekar (CPSO#: 76058 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
Room D2-105
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6242

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERRY ROHEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROHEKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERRY ROHEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROHEKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001