THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Head St., Suite 202
Dundas, ON
L9H 3H8
Dundas Ontario L9H 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 627-9129
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 25 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. R. Brotea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brotea (CPSO#: 76079 )
Business Address: 55 Head Street
Suite 202
Dundas Ontario L9H 3H8
(905) 627-9129

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Head St., Suite 202
Dundas, ON
L9H 3H8
Dundas Ontario L9H 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 627-9129
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 25 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. R. Brotea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brotea (CPSO#: 76079 )
Business Address: 55 Head Street
Suite 202
Dundas Ontario L9H 3H8
(905) 627-9129

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALINA RAMONA BROTEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROTEA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALINA RAMONA BROTEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROTEA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001