THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stouffville Medical Centre
2nd Floor
34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville Ontario L4A 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 640-3100
Fax: (905) 640-5346

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Feb 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 23 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah J. Nunan Barclay Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nunan Barclay (CPSO#: 76081 )
Business Address: 34 Civic Ave
Stouffville ON L4A 1H2
9056403100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stouffville Medical Centre
2nd Floor
34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville Ontario L4A 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 640-3100
Fax: (905) 640-5346

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Feb 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 23 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah J. Nunan Barclay Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nunan Barclay (CPSO#: 76081 )
Business Address: 34 Civic Ave
Stouffville ON L4A 1H2
9056403100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH JANE NUNAN BARCLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUNAN BARCLAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH JANE NUNAN BARCLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUNAN BARCLAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001