THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:08:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14-10088 McLaughlin Rd
Brampton ON L7A 2X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167412273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-51 Mountainash Rd
Brampton ON L6R 1W4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-25 Woodbine Downs Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9W 6N5
Phone: 4167412273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110-3530 Derry Rd E
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Malam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Malam (CPSO#: 76084 )
Business Address: 1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4
Business Address: Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1W8
Business Address: 9135 Keele Street
Unit 45
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 747-3500
Business Address: 4000 Highway 7
Unit 2
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8Z2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, URDU
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14-10088 McLaughlin Rd
Brampton ON L7A 2X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167412273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-51 Mountainash Rd
Brampton ON L6R 1W4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-25 Woodbine Downs Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9W 6N5
Phone: 4167412273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110-3530 Derry Rd E
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Malam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Malam (CPSO#: 76084 )
Business Address: 1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4
Business Address: Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1W8
Business Address: 9135 Keele Street
Unit 45
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 747-3500
Business Address: 4000 Highway 7
Unit 2
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8Z2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAIZ GULAMALI MALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAIZ GULAMALI MALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001