THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:07:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: Marrow, Kimberly Anne (Used Until: 13 Aug 2002)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2250 Bovaird Dr E
Suite 503
Brampton ON L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055954960
Fax: 18444441220
Address: 20 Lynch st
Brampton Ontario L6W2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird drive east
Brampton Ontario L6R3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K Alexander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alexander (CPSO#: 76085 )
Business Address: Suite 503
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 595-4960
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8

General Information

Former Name: Marrow, Kimberly Anne (Used Until: 13 Aug 2002)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2250 Bovaird Dr E
Suite 503
Brampton ON L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055954960
Fax: 18444441220
Address: 20 Lynch st
Brampton Ontario L6W2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird drive east
Brampton Ontario L6R3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K Alexander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alexander (CPSO#: 76085 )
Business Address: Suite 503
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 595-4960
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANNE ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANNE ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001