THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:39:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8454
Fax: 519-685-8241

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 25 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Merritt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Merritt (CPSO#: 76087 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8454
Fax: 519-685-8241

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 25 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Merritt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Merritt (CPSO#: 76087 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL HOWARD MERRITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERRITT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL HOWARD MERRITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERRITT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001