THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:10:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: Morgan, Gillian Mary (Used Until: 15 Jul 2001)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ramblewood Medical Clinic
Unit 101
14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 429-8270
Fax: (705) 429-7611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Brakel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Brakel (CPSO#: 76088 )

General Information

Former Name: Morgan, Gillian Mary (Used Until: 15 Jul 2001)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ramblewood Medical Clinic
Unit 101
14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 429-8270
Fax: (705) 429-7611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Brakel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Brakel (CPSO#: 76088 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN MARY BRAKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAKEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN MARY BRAKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAKEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001