THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:51:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Extension: 2152
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1177 Carey Rd
Oakville Ontario L6J2E3
Phone: 4167258187
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richa Mittal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mittal (CPSO#: 76091 )
Business Address: 235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Extension: 2152
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1177 Carey Rd
Oakville Ontario L6J2E3
Phone: 4167258187
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richa Mittal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mittal (CPSO#: 76091 )
Business Address: 235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHA MITTAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITTAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHA MITTAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITTAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001