THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:53:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Malissa Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yang (CPSO#: 76105 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 715-115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 749-9444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Malissa Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yang (CPSO#: 76105 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 715-115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 749-9444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALISSA YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALISSA YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001