THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:32:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Headwaters Health Care Centre
Emergency Department
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Isabella Szeto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Szeto (CPSO#: 76120 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Family Medicine (Surgical Assists)
Richmond Hill
Business Address: Headwater Health Care Centre
Emergency Department
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410
Business Address: Biopharma Services
4000 Weston Road
North York Ontario M9L 3A2
(416) 747-8484

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Headwaters Health Care Centre
Emergency Department
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Isabella Szeto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Szeto (CPSO#: 76120 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Family Medicine (Surgical Assists)
Richmond Hill
Business Address: Headwater Health Care Centre
Emergency Department
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410
Business Address: Biopharma Services
4000 Weston Road
North York Ontario M9L 3A2
(416) 747-8484

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISABELLA WING-YUK SZETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZETO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISABELLA WING-YUK SZETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZETO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001