THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:52:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: Choi, Jeannie Laura (Used Until: 26 Nov 2007)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 109
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 620-0663
Fax: (416) 620-6689

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeannie Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Richardson (CPSO#: 76147 )

General Information

Former Name: Choi, Jeannie Laura (Used Until: 26 Nov 2007)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 109
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 620-0663
Fax: (416) 620-6689

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeannie Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Richardson (CPSO#: 76147 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANNIE LAURA RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANNIE LAURA RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001