THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:03:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: ? Summit Medical
500 Garafraxa St E. Unit 1A
Fergus Ontario N1M 1E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-383-3333
Fax: 226-383-3321
Address: The Clinic, @ Walmart, Fergus, ON
801 St. David Street N.
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
Phone: (519) 787-2940
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 131 Frederick Campbell St
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
Fergus ON N1M 0H3
Phone: 519-843-2010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Westendorp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Westendorp (CPSO#: 76161 )
Business Address: 1A-500 Garafraxa St E
Fergus ON N1M 1E7
226-383-3333
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
131 Frederick Campbell St
Fergus ON N1M 0H3
519-843-2010
Business Address: 801 St. David Street, North
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
(519) 787-2940

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: ? Summit Medical
500 Garafraxa St E. Unit 1A
Fergus Ontario N1M 1E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-383-3333
Fax: 226-383-3321
Address: The Clinic, @ Walmart, Fergus, ON
801 St. David Street N.
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
Phone: (519) 787-2940
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 131 Frederick Campbell St
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
Fergus ON N1M 0H3
Phone: 519-843-2010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Westendorp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Westendorp (CPSO#: 76161 )
Business Address: 1A-500 Garafraxa St E
Fergus ON N1M 1E7
226-383-3333
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
131 Frederick Campbell St
Fergus ON N1M 0H3
519-843-2010
Business Address: 801 St. David Street, North
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
(519) 787-2940

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW WILLIAM WESTENDORP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTENDORP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW WILLIAM WESTENDORP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTENDORP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001