THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:40:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13291 Yonge Street
403
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-751-2941
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Extension: 2346
Fax: (705) 434-5219
Address: Alliston Diagnostic Centre
117 Young Street, Unit 21
Alliston, ON
L9R 0E9
Alliston Ontario L9R 0E9
Phone: 705-434-0074
Fax: 705-434-9074
Address: 5293 Highway 7
Canadian Vascular Laboratories-Markham
Suite 209
Markham Ontario L3P 7M7
Phone: (289) 301-6622
Fax: (289) 301-6621
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 535 Mulock Drive
Suite 300
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
Phone: (905) 953-9044
Fax: (905) 954-1113
Address: 30 Disera Drive
Canadian Vascular Laboratories- Thornhill
Suite 240
Vaughan Ontario L4J 0A7
Phone: (416) 221-9001
Fax: (416) 221-0094

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zeman (CPSO#: 76163 )
Business Address: 21 - 117 Young Street
Alliston Ontario L9R 0E9
(705) 434-0074
Business Address: 200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: Oak Ridge Medical Centre
Unit 303
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 751-2941
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13291 Yonge Street
403
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-751-2941
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Extension: 2346
Fax: (705) 434-5219
Address: Alliston Diagnostic Centre
117 Young Street, Unit 21
Alliston, ON
L9R 0E9
Alliston Ontario L9R 0E9
Phone: 705-434-0074
Fax: 705-434-9074
Address: 5293 Highway 7
Canadian Vascular Laboratories-Markham
Suite 209
Markham Ontario L3P 7M7
Phone: (289) 301-6622
Fax: (289) 301-6621
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 535 Mulock Drive
Suite 300
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
Phone: (905) 953-9044
Fax: (905) 954-1113
Address: 30 Disera Drive
Canadian Vascular Laboratories- Thornhill
Suite 240
Vaughan Ontario L4J 0A7
Phone: (416) 221-9001
Fax: (416) 221-0094

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zeman (CPSO#: 76163 )
Business Address: 21 - 117 Young Street
Alliston Ontario L9R 0E9
(705) 434-0074
Business Address: 200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: Oak Ridge Medical Centre
Unit 303
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 751-2941
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER RONALD ZEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER RONALD ZEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001