THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-4125 Lawrence Ave E
Pain Physician DAAPM DCAPM
Scarborough Pain Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473478080
Fax: 6473478280

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chen (CPSO#: 76193 )
Business Address: 4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 208
Scarborough Ontario M1E 2S2
(647) 347-8080
Business Address: Toronto Poly Clinic
Unit 204
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
(416) 250-7171

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-4125 Lawrence Ave E
Pain Physician DAAPM DCAPM
Scarborough Pain Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473478080
Fax: 6473478280

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chen (CPSO#: 76193 )
Business Address: 4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 208
Scarborough Ontario M1E 2S2
(647) 347-8080
Business Address: Toronto Poly Clinic
Unit 204
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
(416) 250-7171

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACKY SENG LEONG CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACKY SENG LEONG CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001