THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:15:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bramalea CHC
40 Finchgate Ave
Suite 224
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 451 6959
Fax: 905 451 0458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Aug 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 08 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tyler J. Curtis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Curtis (CPSO#: 76200 )
Business Address: 430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
(416) 470-6690

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bramalea CHC
40 Finchgate Ave
Suite 224
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 451 6959
Fax: 905 451 0458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Aug 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 08 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tyler J. Curtis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Curtis (CPSO#: 76200 )
Business Address: 430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
(416) 470-6690

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TYLER JACOB CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TYLER JACOB CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001