THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:29:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 301
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058819810
Fax: 7059153500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hochman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 301
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058819810
Fax: 7059153500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hochman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE REGAN HOCHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE REGAN HOCHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001