THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:14:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1972
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sanomed clinic
1000 Bay street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 923-7770
Extension: 2
Fax: (416) 901-7794

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nahed Mishriki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mishriki (CPSO#: 76208 )
Business Address: SanoMed Medical Clinic
1000 Bay Street
Unit A
Toronto Ontario M5S 3A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sanomed clinic
1000 Bay street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 923-7770
Extension: 2
Fax: (416) 901-7794

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nahed Mishriki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mishriki (CPSO#: 76208 )
Business Address: SanoMed Medical Clinic
1000 Bay Street
Unit A
Toronto Ontario M5S 3A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAHED RAOUF MISHRIKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISHRIKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAHED RAOUF MISHRIKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISHRIKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001